THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:11:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
150 Strickland Street, Suite 1
Douro Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 651-0502
Fax: (705) 651-0503
Address: Lakield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-7112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-28 Alma St
actual address 99 Alma Street
Norwood ON K0L 2V0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hughes (CPSO#: 71758 )
Business Address: 99 Alma Street
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Business Address: Suite 1
150 Strickland Road
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 651-0502
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Lakefield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 655-7112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
150 Strickland Street, Suite 1
Douro Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 651-0502
Fax: (705) 651-0503
Address: Lakield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-7112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-28 Alma St
actual address 99 Alma Street
Norwood ON K0L 2V0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hughes (CPSO#: 71758 )
Business Address: 99 Alma Street
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Business Address: Suite 1
150 Strickland Road
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 651-0502
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Lakefield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
(705) 655-7112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN JAMES HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN JAMES HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997