THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:27:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor, Ontario
N8X3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mikhail (CPSO#: 71763 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444
Business Address: Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 977-6643
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor, Ontario
N8X3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mikhail (CPSO#: 71763 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444
Business Address: Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 977-6643
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND GIRGIS MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND GIRGIS MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1997