THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 105-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 503-6333
Fax: 705 503 3336
Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
Phone: (905) 358-0171
Fax: (905) 358-8435
Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Bengezi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Bengezi (CPSO#: 71787 )
Business Address: 115 - 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 788-0555
Business Address: suite 105-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
705 5036333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 105-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 503-6333
Fax: 705 503 3336
Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
Phone: (905) 358-0171
Fax: (905) 358-8435
Address: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Bengezi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Bengezi (CPSO#: 71787 )
Business Address: 115 - 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 788-0555
Business Address: suite 105-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
705 5036333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ABDALLA BENGEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGEZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ABDALLA BENGEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGEZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997