THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2295 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167789893
Fax: 4167786065
Address: Albany Medical clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416)461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leke Badmos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Badmos (CPSO#: 71798 )
Business Address: Suite 307
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 778-9893

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2295 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167789893
Fax: 4167786065
Address: Albany Medical clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416)461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leke Badmos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Badmos (CPSO#: 71798 )
Business Address: Suite 307
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7
(416) 778-9893

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLULEKE SALIMON BADMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADMOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLULEKE SALIMON BADMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADMOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1997