THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:49:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
300 Main street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-3323
Fax: 519 4213933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faisal Almane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Mane (CPSO#: 71845 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
300 Main street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-3323
Fax: 519 4213933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faisal Almane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Mane (CPSO#: 71845 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL MANE AL-MANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL MANE AL-MANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1997