THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Azhar University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shabib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shabib (CPSO#: 71877 )
Business Address: 205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Azhar University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shabib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shabib (CPSO#: 71877 )
Business Address: 205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAD MOHAMMED HISHAM SHABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAD MOHAMMED HISHAM SHABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: Al-Azhar University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1997