THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 453-5789
Fax: (888) 248-1241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Omran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ben Omran (CPSO#: 71893 )
Business Address: 207 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
(905) 453-5789

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 453-5789
Fax: (888) 248-1241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Omran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ben Omran (CPSO#: 71893 )
Business Address: 207 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 0X5
(905) 453-5789

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIMA BEN OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN OMRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIMA BEN OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN OMRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1997