THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bodok-Nutzati, Rebecca (Used Until: 09 Sep 2008)
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 QUEEN STREET NORTH
Bolton Ontario L7E 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 951-1173
Fax: (905) 951-9716
Address: 9901 keele street unit 109
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y5
Phone: (905) 951-3428
Extension: 22
Fax: (905) 951-9716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bodok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bodok (CPSO#: 71902 )
Business Address: 109 - 9901 Keele Street East
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y5
(905) 951-3428
Business Address: 8 Queen Street North
Bolton Ontario L7E 1C8
(905) 951-1173

General Information

Former Name: Bodok-Nutzati, Rebecca (Used Until: 09 Sep 2008)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 QUEEN STREET NORTH
Bolton Ontario L7E 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 951-1173
Fax: (905) 951-9716
Address: 9901 keele street unit 109
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y5
Phone: (905) 951-3428
Extension: 22
Fax: (905) 951-9716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bodok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bodok (CPSO#: 71902 )
Business Address: 109 - 9901 Keele Street East
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y5
(905) 951-3428
Business Address: 8 Queen Street North
Bolton Ontario L7E 1C8
(905) 951-1173

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA BODOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA BODOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1997