THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:12:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System (BCH)
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System (PMC)
20, Lynch Street
Brampton,ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System (EGH)
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke,ON
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arun Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhardwaj (CPSO#: 71910 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System (BCH)
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System (PMC)
20, Lynch Street
Brampton,ON
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System (EGH)
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke,ON
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arun Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhardwaj (CPSO#: 71910 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARUN BHARDWAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARDWAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARUN BHARDWAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARDWAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1997