THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4523
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marjan M. Nezarati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahdavi-Nezarati (CPSO#: 71997 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4523
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marjan M. Nezarati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahdavi-Nezarati (CPSO#: 71997 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN MAHDAVI-NEZARATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDAVI-NEZARATI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN MAHDAVI-NEZARATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDAVI-NEZARATI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 1997