THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Surgical Centre
1st Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4922
Fax: (905) 721-6648

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 72008 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Surgical Centre
1st Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4922
Fax: (905) 721-6648

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 72008 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULMAJID SALEH IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULMAJID SALEH IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1997