THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:54:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Riga Medical Institute, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6205
Fax: (413) 340-3698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Djaiani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Djaiani (CPSO#: 72114 )
Business Address: 1366 Queen Victoria Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3H3
(416) 300-6624
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Riga Medical Institute, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6205
Fax: (413) 340-3698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Djaiani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Djaiani (CPSO#: 72114 )
Business Address: 1366 Queen Victoria Avenue
Mississauga Ontario L5H 3H3
(416) 300-6624
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE NESTER DJAIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJAIANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE NESTER DJAIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJAIANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Riga Medical Institute, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1998