THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:36:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Room 2015 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-6329
Fax: (613) 533-6855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. James (CPSO#: 72135 ) Dr. D. Engen (CPSO#: 73829 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Room 2015 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-6329
Fax: (613) 533-6855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. James (CPSO#: 72135 ) Dr. D. Engen (CPSO#: 73829 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA DENISE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA DENISE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1998