THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 582 4111
Fax: (289) 837 1007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Maria Jaroszynska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaroszynska (CPSO#: 72140 )
Business Address: Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 582-4111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 582 4111
Fax: (289) 837 1007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Maria Jaroszynska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaroszynska (CPSO#: 72140 )
Business Address: Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 582-4111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA JAROSZYNSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAROSZYNSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA JAROSZYNSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAROSZYNSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 1998