THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:48:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
9th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4549
Fax: (416) 586-8654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill Mah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mah (CPSO#: 72161 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
927 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4549

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
9th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4549
Fax: (416) 586-8654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bill Mah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mah (CPSO#: 72161 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
927 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4549

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM BILL MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM BILL MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998