THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:06:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
Johnson 6 Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3203
Fax: (613) 544-1454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Baxter (CPSO#: 72162 )
Business Address: Ontario Medical Mobile Eye Care Unit, CNIB
303 York Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2A5
(705) 675-2468
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3203

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
Johnson 6 Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3203
Fax: (613) 544-1454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Baxter (CPSO#: 72162 )
Business Address: Ontario Medical Mobile Eye Care Unit, CNIB
303 York Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2A5
(705) 675-2468
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3203

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998