THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:24:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chahine, Natalie Vikki (Used Until: 25 Jun 2002)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
Intensive Care Unit
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 33100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Chahine-Malus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chahine-Malus (CPSO#: 72169 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 3100

General Information

Former Name: Chahine, Natalie Vikki (Used Until: 25 Jun 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
Intensive Care Unit
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 33100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Chahine-Malus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chahine-Malus (CPSO#: 72169 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 3100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE VIKKI CHAHINE-MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHINE-MALUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE VIKKI CHAHINE-MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHINE-MALUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998