THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:32:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Otolaryngology Department
Hdh
144 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: (613) 547-5654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason H. Franklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Franklin (CPSO#: 72192 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Otolaryngology Department
Hdh
144 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: (613) 547-5654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason H. Franklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Franklin (CPSO#: 72192 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON HOWARD FRANKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON HOWARD FRANKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998