THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 18:54:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-7878
Extension: 2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Becker (CPSO#: 72197 )
Business Address: Queensway Carlton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-7878 Extn: 2777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-7878
Extension: 2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Becker (CPSO#: 72197 )
Business Address: Queensway Carlton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-7878 Extn: 2777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998