THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Medical Centre
Unit 0100
150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: (905) 945-4772
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Site
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Fax: (905) 945-0504
Address: 75 Macneil Crt
West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: 905-768-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital Site
711 Concession St.
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: 519-426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-704-4195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Samuels Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Samuels (CPSO#: 72199 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Family Medical Centre
0100-150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
(905) 945-5424
Business Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Medical Centre
Unit 0100
150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: (905) 945-4772
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Site
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Fax: (905) 945-0504
Address: 75 Macneil Crt
West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: 905-768-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital Site
711 Concession St.
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: 519-426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-704-4195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Samuels Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Samuels (CPSO#: 72199 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Family Medical Centre
0100-150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
(905) 945-5424
Business Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Business Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL SAMUELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUELS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL SAMUELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUELS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998