THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Family Health Team
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-2273
Fax: (519) 672-2668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Ouellet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ouellet (CPSO#: 72216 )
Business Address: London Family Health Team
1 - 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
(519) 672-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Family Health Team
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-2273
Fax: (519) 672-2668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tracy Ouellet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ouellet (CPSO#: 72216 )
Business Address: London Family Health Team
1 - 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 0G6
(519) 672-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY LARA OUELLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY LARA OUELLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998