THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-6033
Fax: (519) 253-6866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Polsky and Milrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Polsky (CPSO#: 70347 ) Dr. E. Milrod (CPSO#: 72220 )
Business Address: Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
(519) 253-6033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-6033
Fax: (519) 253-6866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Polsky and Milrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Polsky (CPSO#: 70347 ) Dr. E. Milrod (CPSO#: 72220 )
Business Address: Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
(519) 253-6033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE GABRIELLE MILROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILROD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE GABRIELLE MILROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILROD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998