THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cummer Lodge, Long Term Care Home
205 Cummer Ave
North York Ontario M2M 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-392-9525
Fax: 416-397-9779
Address: 555 Finch Ave W
Reactivation Care Centre
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: 4166352488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maureen Gottesman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gottesman (CPSO#: 72228 )
Business Address: Reactivation Care Centre
North York General Hospital-Finch Site
555 Finch Ave West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
416 635 2488
Business Address: Cummer Lodge Long Term Care Home
205 Cummer Avenue
Unit 2 South
Toronto Ontario M2M 2E8
(416) 392-9525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cummer Lodge, Long Term Care Home
205 Cummer Ave
North York Ontario M2M 2E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-392-9525
Fax: 416-397-9779
Address: 555 Finch Ave W
Reactivation Care Centre
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: 4166352488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maureen Gottesman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gottesman (CPSO#: 72228 )
Business Address: Reactivation Care Centre
North York General Hospital-Finch Site
555 Finch Ave West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
416 635 2488
Business Address: Cummer Lodge Long Term Care Home
205 Cummer Avenue
Unit 2 South
Toronto Ontario M2M 2E8
(416) 392-9525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAUREEN CARA GOTTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTESMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAUREEN CARA GOTTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTESMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998