THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:39:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058490688
Fax: 9058491596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naveen Arya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arya (CPSO#: 72239 )
Business Address: Suite 1
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
(905) 849-0688

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058490688
Fax: 9058491596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naveen Arya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arya (CPSO#: 72239 )
Business Address: Suite 1
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
(905) 849-0688

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVEEN ARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVEEN ARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998