THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 72240 )
Business Address: Medical Clinic
701 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 4T7
(519) 660-5199
Business Address: 190 Wortley Road
Lifemark Physiotherapy Wortley Village
Dr S Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corp
Suite 207
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
519-432-0835
Business Address: 190 Wortley Road
Lifemark Physiotherapy Wortley Village
Dr S Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corp
Suite 207
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
519-432-0835

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 72240 )
Business Address: Medical Clinic
701 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N5Y 4T7
(519) 660-5199
Business Address: 190 Wortley Road
Lifemark Physiotherapy Wortley Village
Dr S Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corp
Suite 207
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
519-432-0835
Business Address: 190 Wortley Road
Lifemark Physiotherapy Wortley Village
Dr S Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corp
Suite 207
London Ontario N6C 4Y7
519-432-0835

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHILPA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHILPA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998