THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:13:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Extension: 31000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maranda (CPSO#: 72244 )
Business Address: Suite 101
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
(613) 632-5333
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Extension: 31000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Maranda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maranda (CPSO#: 72244 )
Business Address: Suite 101
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
(613) 632-5333
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE PATRICIA MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE PATRICIA MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998