THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:27:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 5142
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7732
Fax: (416) 323-6306
Address: The Carlton Skin Clinic
187 Carlton street, Toronto,
M5A 2K
Toronto Ontario M5A2K7
Phone: 289-301-3011
Fax: 289-301-3081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christian Murray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray (CPSO#: 72250 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
5142 - 76 Grenville Street
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7732

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 5142
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7732
Fax: (416) 323-6306
Address: The Carlton Skin Clinic
187 Carlton street, Toronto,
M5A 2K
Toronto Ontario M5A2K7
Phone: 289-301-3011
Fax: 289-301-3081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christian Murray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray (CPSO#: 72250 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
5142 - 76 Grenville Street
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7732

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ALEXANDER MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ALEXANDER MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998