THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:24:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Pugh, Jillian Anne (Used Until: 12 Sep 2004)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Extension: 6295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jillian Feberwee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feberwee (CPSO#: 72251 )
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
327 Reynolds Avenue
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
(905) 338-4601 Extn: 5
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5

General Information

Former Name: Pugh, Jillian Anne (Used Until: 12 Sep 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Extension: 6295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jillian Feberwee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feberwee (CPSO#: 72251 )
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
327 Reynolds Avenue
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
(905) 338-4601 Extn: 5
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILLIAN ANNE FEBERWEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEBERWEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILLIAN ANNE FEBERWEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEBERWEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998