THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Rd
Suite 106
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
Suite 3G
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Merali (CPSO#: 72259 )
Business Address: Suite 106
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(855) 210-0757

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Rd
Suite 106
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Upper Centennial Pky
Suite 3G
Stoney Creek ON L8J 3W2
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Merali (CPSO#: 72259 )
Business Address: Suite 106
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Address: 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(855) 210-0757

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA SADRUDIN MANJI MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA SADRUDIN MANJI MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998