THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4576 Yonge St
Sleep and Alertness Clinic
Suite 100
North York ON M2N 6N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: 647-427-4928
Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: 647-427-4928
Address: 801 Eglinton Ave W
Venn Med
Suite 201
Toronto ON M5N 1E3
Phone: 416-494-2288
Fax: 416-479-0655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adit Margaliot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Margaliot (CPSO#: 72261 )
Business Address: Suite 301
845 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1E6
(416) 635-0909
Business Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 837-8181

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4576 Yonge St
Sleep and Alertness Clinic
Suite 100
North York ON M2N 6N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: 647-427-4928
Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-837-8181
Fax: 647-427-4928
Address: 801 Eglinton Ave W
Venn Med
Suite 201
Toronto ON M5N 1E3
Phone: 416-494-2288
Fax: 416-479-0655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adit Margaliot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Margaliot (CPSO#: 72261 )
Business Address: Suite 301
845 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1E6
(416) 635-0909
Business Address: Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 837-8181

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADIT MARGALIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGALIOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADIT MARGALIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGALIOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998