THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:15:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-226-726-8440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie St
SMGH
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: 5192455295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. De Santis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. De Santis (CPSO#: 72278 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Surgery
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-226-726-8440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie St
SMGH
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: 5192455295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.A. De Santis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. De Santis (CPSO#: 72278 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Surgery
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA ANNA DE SANTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SANTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA ANNA DE SANTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SANTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998