THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 King St W
Better BRIA Inc.
Unit 6200, PO Box 50
Toronto ON M5X 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-2742
Fax: 416-646-2741

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ariel K. Dalfen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dalfen (CPSO#: 72279 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5131
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
BRIA Inc.
Suite 6200, PO Box 50
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 King St W
Better BRIA Inc.
Unit 6200, PO Box 50
Toronto ON M5X 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-2742
Fax: 416-646-2741

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ariel K. Dalfen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dalfen (CPSO#: 72279 )
Business Address: Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5131
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
BRIA Inc.
Suite 6200, PO Box 50
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL KATHERINE DALFEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALFEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIEL KATHERINE DALFEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALFEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998