THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 507
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-7622
Fax: (905) 828-7769
Address: 61 Queen Street East
7th floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alice Yuk-Yan Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng (CPSO#: 72291 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 27-420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3K2
Business Address: 507 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-7622

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 507
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-7622
Fax: (905) 828-7769
Address: 61 Queen Street East
7th floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-7424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alice Yuk-Yan Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng (CPSO#: 72291 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 27-420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3K2
Business Address: 507 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-7622

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICE YUK-YAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALICE YUK-YAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998