THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:43:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-780-6873
Fax: 905-780-6894
Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chu (CPSO#: 72295 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 780-8823
Business Address: 9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
(905) 780-8823
Business Address: 57 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1G8
(905) 780-6873

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-780-6873
Fax: 905-780-6894
Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chu (CPSO#: 72295 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 780-8823
Business Address: 9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V7
(905) 780-8823
Business Address: 57 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1G8
(905) 780-6873

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC KUO-CHI CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC KUO-CHI CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998