THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-5500
Fax: (416) 923-2249

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raquel Adelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adelstein (CPSO#: 72297 )
Business Address: 206 - 815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
(416) 923-9606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-5500
Fax: (416) 923-2249

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raquel Adelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adelstein (CPSO#: 72297 )
Business Address: 206 - 815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
(416) 923-9606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAQUEL ADELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAQUEL ADELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998