THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Main Floor
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Address: 1017 Wilson Ave
Regent Medical Clinic
Suite 102
North York ON M3K 1Z1
Phone: 416-398-4500
Fax: 416-398-4700
Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Appelby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Appelby (CPSO#: 72298 )
Business Address: 1017 Wilson Ave
Regent Medical Clinic
Suite 102
416-398-4500
Business Address: 2355 Keele Street
Suite D2
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 244-4377
Business Address: Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
(416) 489-2106
Business Address: Regent Medical Clinic
2737 Keele Street
Suite 102
North York Ontario M3M 2E9
(416) 398-4500
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Main Floor
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Address: 1017 Wilson Ave
Regent Medical Clinic
Suite 102
North York ON M3K 1Z1
Phone: 416-398-4500
Fax: 416-398-4700
Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Appelby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Appelby (CPSO#: 72298 )
Business Address: 1017 Wilson Ave
Regent Medical Clinic
Suite 102
416-398-4500
Business Address: 2355 Keele Street
Suite D2
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 244-4377
Business Address: Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
(416) 489-2106
Business Address: Regent Medical Clinic
2737 Keele Street
Suite 102
North York Ontario M3M 2E9
(416) 398-4500
Business Address: Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 4B8
(416) 780-9986

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK EVAN APPELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK EVAN APPELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPELBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998