THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.L. Barker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barker (CPSO#: 72299 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-General Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 46368
Business Address: 690 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 72000
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42285

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.L. Barker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barker (CPSO#: 72299 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-General Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 46368
Business Address: 690 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A4
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 72000
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42285

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LYNN BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LYNN BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998