THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2023
Fax: (519) 376-1145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart Manwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manwell (CPSO#: 72304 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2023
Fax: (519) 376-1145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart Manwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manwell (CPSO#: 72304 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART ERNEST ERIC MANWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART ERNEST ERIC MANWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998