THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:23:40 PM

General Information

Former Name: Dayan-Wald, Rachel Maya (Used Until: 22 Nov 2007) Dayan, Rachel Maya (Used Until: 02 May 2002)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Room 5N 517
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5502
Fax: (416) 340-5014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wald (CPSO#: 72307 ) Dr. R. Wald (CPSO#: 73865 )

General Information

Former Name: Dayan-Wald, Rachel Maya (Used Until: 22 Nov 2007) Dayan, Rachel Maya (Used Until: 02 May 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Room 5N 517
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5502
Fax: (416) 340-5014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wald (CPSO#: 72307 ) Dr. R. Wald (CPSO#: 73865 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL MAYA WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL MAYA WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998