THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:56:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9050
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4606
Fax: (416) 340-4767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anand Ghanekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarjeant (CPSO#: 72562 ) Dr. A. Ghanekar (CPSO#: 72310 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
11 PMB 171
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9050
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4606
Fax: (416) 340-4767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anand Ghanekar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarjeant (CPSO#: 72562 ) Dr. A. Ghanekar (CPSO#: 72310 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7654
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
11 PMB 171
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAND GHANEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANEKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAND GHANEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANEKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998