THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
125 Pedersen Dr., Units 3, 4, 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Phone: (905) 751-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
679 Davis Drive, Suite 104
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 895-1313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
250 Harding Blvd. W., Suite B02
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-0595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
955 Major Mackenzie Dr., Suite 102
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-6336
Fax: (289) 553-6339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. P. Lan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Lan (CPSO#: 72316 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
9058831212
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Units 3 - 4 - 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora Ontario L4E 0E3
(905) 751-1500
Business Address: Suite B02
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Suite 104
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
125 Pedersen Dr., Units 3, 4, 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Phone: (905) 751-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
679 Davis Drive, Suite 104
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 895-1313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
250 Harding Blvd. W., Suite B02
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-0595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: X-Ray Associates
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
955 Major Mackenzie Dr., Suite 102
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-6336
Fax: (289) 553-6339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. P. Lan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Lan (CPSO#: 72316 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
9058831212
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Units 3 - 4 - 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora Ontario L4E 0E3
(905) 751-1500
Business Address: Suite B02
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Suite 104
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK PAUL LAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK PAUL LAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998