THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:17:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 278 Metcalfe Street West
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-245-3590
Fax: 1-519-245-6032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Marcou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marcou (CPSO#: 72322 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 31 Caradoc Street North
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2M5
(519) 245-3590

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 278 Metcalfe Street West
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-245-3590
Fax: 1-519-245-6032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Marcou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marcou (CPSO#: 72322 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-1550
Business Address: 31 Caradoc Street North
Strathroy Ontario N7G 2M5
(519) 245-3590

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MARCOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MARCOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998