THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
1280 Main Street West
5 North - Room 529
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 44648
Fax: (905) 523-6776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies
Canada - Northwest Territories
Uganda

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.A. Petrisor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Petrisor (CPSO#: 72335 )
Business Address: 231 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44648
Business Address: Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
5N-529 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
1280 Main Street West
5 North - Room 529
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 44648
Fax: (905) 523-6776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies
Canada - Northwest Territories
Uganda

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.A. Petrisor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Petrisor (CPSO#: 72335 )
Business Address: 231 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44648
Business Address: Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
5N-529 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALLAN PETRISOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRISOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALLAN PETRISOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRISOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998