THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street
Unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 1
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Uptown Eye Specialists
221-2180 Steeles Ave. West
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Uptown Eye Specialists
2101 Brimley Road, Unit 109
Scarborough Ontario M1S 2B4
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 3
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
600 University Ave., Rm 411
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
Address: unit 120-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tam (CPSO#: 72341 )
Business Address: 401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(905) 456-9500
Business Address: 411 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5151
Business Address: 2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto Ontario M1S 2B4
(416) 292-0330
Business Address: 221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
(905) 761-7002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street
Unit 401
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 1
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Uptown Eye Specialists
221-2180 Steeles Ave. West
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Uptown Eye Specialists
2101 Brimley Road, Unit 109
Scarborough Ontario M1S 2B4
Phone: 416-292-0330
Extension: 3
Fax: 416-292-0331
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
600 University Ave., Rm 411
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
Address: unit 120-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tam (CPSO#: 72341 )
Business Address: 401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(905) 456-9500
Business Address: 411 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 5151
Business Address: 2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto Ontario M1S 2B4
(416) 292-0330
Business Address: 221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord Ontario L4K 2Z5
(905) 761-7002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC SIU LUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC SIU LUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998