THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 384
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Tanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tanna (CPSO#: 72342 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 384
1929 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Tanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tanna (CPSO#: 72342 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMINI VANDRAVAN TANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEMINI VANDRAVAN TANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998