THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:31:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cavalcanti Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lipscombe (CPSO#: 72347 ) Dr. R. Cavalcanti (CPSO#: 71445 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
E W 8 - 420
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6412
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
(416) 323-6013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cavalcanti Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lipscombe (CPSO#: 72347 ) Dr. R. Cavalcanti (CPSO#: 71445 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
E W 8 - 420
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6412
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B1
(416) 323-6013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE LUCILLE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE LUCILLE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998