THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:44:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 3671
Fax: (519) 973-4429

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eli Malus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Malus (CPSO#: 72348 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E3
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 3671
Business Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Extension: 3671
Fax: (519) 973-4429

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eli Malus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Malus (CPSO#: 72348 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E3
(519) 973-4411 Extn: 3671
Business Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998