THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: the arva clinic
14351 Medway Rd
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 434-5007
Fax: (519) 672-5007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew E. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thompson (CPSO#: 72355 )
Business Address: The Arva Clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
(519) 434-5007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: the arva clinic
14351 Medway Rd
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 434-5007
Fax: (519) 672-5007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew E. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thompson (CPSO#: 72355 )
Business Address: The Arva Clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
(519) 434-5007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW EDEN THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW EDEN THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998