THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:12:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613)756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River District Hospital
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 613-584-3333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Y. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Woo (CPSO#: 72367 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613)756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River District Hospital
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 613-584-3333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2649 Concession Rd
Kemptville District Hospital
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Y. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Woo (CPSO#: 72367 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL YUAN-CHU WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL YUAN-CHU WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998