THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 370-2266
Fax: (519) 372-0731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd M. Webster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Webster (CPSO#: 72368 )
Business Address: 209 - 1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 2J1
(519) 370-2266

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 370-2266
Fax: (519) 372-0731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd M. Webster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Webster (CPSO#: 72368 )
Business Address: 209 - 1101 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 2J1
(519) 370-2266

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD MICHAEL WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD MICHAEL WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998